NV SB40 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - In Senate. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to occupational safety; revising the period of time in which an employer must notify the Division of Industrial Relations of the Department of Business and Industry of the employer's intent to contest the issuance of a citation or proposed assessment of a penalty by the Division; revising provisions governing the amounts of administrative fines which the Division is authorized or required to assess against an employer for certain violations of occupational safety and health laws; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing penalties for violating occupational safety laws. (BDR 53-222)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-16AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-15AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-04-17AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 7.) To printer.
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-21SenateFrom printer.
2018-11-19SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback