NV SB398 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-11 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the sale or transfer of ivory under certain circumstances. (BDR 52-1022)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the sale or transfer of ivory under certain circumstances. (BDR 52-1022)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-11Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
2015-04-02SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-03-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback