NV SB397 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 136. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public safety; exempting certain railroad companies from provisions governing operators of subsurface installations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to subsurface installations. (BDR 40-962)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 136. (Effective July 1, 2023)
2023-05-26SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-05-23SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2023-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2023-05-22AssemblyRead second time.
2023-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-04-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
2023-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2023-04-18SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-04-17SenateRead second time.
2023-04-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-03-28SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback