NV SB392 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2019 Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to energy. (BDR 58-663)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to energy. (BDR 58-663)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16SenateVetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2019 Session)
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateAssembly Amendment No. 1138 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-04AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-04AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1138.) To printer.
2017-06-04AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateTo printer.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.)
2017-05-31SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1020.)
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-31SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-21SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-20SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 381.)
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-13SenateWaiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.
2017-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback