NV SB391 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to dentistry; revising provisions relating to the State Dental Health Officer and State Public Health Dental Hygienist; requiring hospitals and issuers of Medicaid managed care plans to take certain measures to ensure access by recipients of Medicaid to teledentistry; authorizing the issuance of a permit as a dental responder to a dentist, dental hygienist or dental therapist who meets certain requirements; authorizing a dental responder to perform certain duties during a declared emergency, disaster, public health emergency or other health event; creating and prescribing the duties of the Committee on Dental Emergency Management; revising the membership of the Committee on Emergency Medical Services; requiring a public or private school or child care facility to accept a dental examination, screening or assessment provided through teledentistry for certain purposes; requiring dental hygienists and dental therapists to comply with certain requirements governing the provision of health care; imposing certain requirements relating to the provision of services through teledentistry; requiring certain providers of dental care to receive training concerning teledentistry; prescribing certain requirements relating to the electronic storage of records; deeming certain conduct by a provider of dental care to be unprofessional conduct; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to dentistry. (BDR 40-455)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11SenateVetoed by the Governor.
2021-05-27SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-24SenateAssembly Amendment No. 754 concurred in. To enrollment.
2021-05-24SenateIn Senate.
2021-05-24AssemblyTo Senate.
2021-05-24AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2021-05-21AssemblyTo printer.
2021-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 9, Absent: 1.)
2021-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 754.) Dispensed with reprinting.
2021-05-21AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2021-05-21AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2021-05-21AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2021-05-21AssemblyTaken from General File.
2021-05-20AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-19AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-18AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-17AssemblyRead second time.
2021-05-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-04-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2021-04-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2021-04-20SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 268.) To printer.
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback