NV SB390 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 544.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extending and revising the Zoom schools program for the 2017-2019 biennium. (BDR S-788)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending and revising the Zoom schools program for the 2017-2019 biennium. (BDR S-788)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 544.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate.
2017-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended.
2017-05-24SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-05-23SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-05-23SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 848.)
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-23SenateFrom committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2017-04-24SenateRe-referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Re-refer to Committee on Education.
2017-04-17SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=855
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB390.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB390_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB390_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1160&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=390&fldBillname=SB390
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1360&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=390&fldBillname=SB390
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=143&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=390&fldBillname=SB390
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=872&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=390&fldBillname=SB390

Bill Comments

feedback