NV SB387 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the issuance of certain orders for protection. (BDR 3-839)
Title
Provides for the issuance of certain orders for protection. (BDR 3-839)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 443.) To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |