NV SB386 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Waiver granted effective: April 8, 2021..
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to employment practices; requiring certain employers to provide certain employees with written notices containing certain information in the event of a layoff; requiring an employer to retain certain information relating to a laid-off employee; requiring an employer to offer certain job positions to a laid-off employee under certain circumstances; prohibiting an employer from taking certain adverse actions against certain persons; authorizing civil actions to enforce certain provisions; providing for the severability of certain provisions by a court under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to certain businesses. (BDR 53-1010)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateWaiver granted effective: April 8, 2021..
2021-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback