NV SB382 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to sales and use taxes. (BDR 32-660)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to sales and use taxes. (BDR 32-660)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-16Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2015-04-24AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
2015-04-24AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-21SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-04-21SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 274.) To printer.
2015-04-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback