NV SB380 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 547.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to prescription drugs; revising the information that is reported under the program for tracking and reporting of information concerning the pricing of prescription drugs; requiring wholesalers to make a report; requiring certain reporting entities to affirm the accuracy of the information in the reports; revising requirements concerning the report of the Department of Health and Human Services on the pricing of prescription drugs; revising the authorized uses of certain administrative penalties; excluding certain information from protection as a trade secret; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the reporting of data concerning the prices of prescription drugs. (BDR 40-445)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 547.
2021-06-02SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-31SenateAssembly Amendment No. 855 concurred in. To enrollment.
2021-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2021-05-31AssemblyTo Senate.
2021-05-31AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2021-05-31AssemblyTo printer.
2021-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.)
2021-05-31AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2021-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 855.)
2021-05-31AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2021-05-31AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2021-05-31AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2021-05-31AssemblyTaken from General File.
2021-05-31AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2021-05-31AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-05-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2021-05-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-05-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2021-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended.
2021-04-22SenateExemption effective.
2021-04-22SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2021-04-20SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2021-04-20SenateTaken from General File.
2021-04-20SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 426.)
2021-04-20SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2021-04-19SenateRead second time.
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback