NV SB376 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 567.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to gaming. (BDR 41-480)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to gaming. (BDR 41-480)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 567.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-06SenateTo enrollment.
2017-06-06SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-05SenateTo printer.
2017-06-05Senate(Conference Amend. No. CA9.)
2017-06-05SenateConference report adopted by Assembly.
2017-06-05SenateConference report adopted by Senate.
2017-06-05SenateFrom committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 682 and further amend.
2017-06-02SenateConference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
2017-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Amendment No. 682 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-25SenateAssembly Amendment No. 682 not concurred in. To Assembly.
2017-05-24SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2017-05-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-19AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-18AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-17AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-16AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 682.) To printer.
2017-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-19AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-04-19AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-18SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-17SenateRead second time.
2017-04-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback