NV SB375 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state business licenses; revising the threshold for determining whether certain persons and entities who operate home-based businesses are exempt from the requirement to obtain a state business license; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises threshold for determining whether certain persons and entities who operate home-based businesses are exempt from the requirement to obtain a state business license. (BDR 7-773)
Sponsors
Sen. Ira Hansen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 251.) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2019-04-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |