NV SB374 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation; providing for the imposition, administration, collection and enforcement of a tax on certain digital products electronically transferred to a purchaser; extending the excise tax on admission to certain facilities where live entertainment is provided to include the increase in price of a ticket for admission upon resale; requiring the Department of Taxation to treat a construction contractor as the consumer of tangible personal property used in performing a construction contract; revising provisions relating to the imposition of transient lodging taxes on the gross receipts of room remarketers from the reserving of, arranging for, conveying of or furnishing of the right to use or occupy transient lodging; establishing provisions regulating the lease of a passenger car through a personal vehicle sharing program; imposing a governmental services fee and authorizing certain counties to impose a fee on the lease of a passenger car through a personal vehicle sharing program; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to taxation. (BDR 32-161)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
2021-04-08SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2021-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback