NV SB371 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the use of apprentices on public works. (BDR 53-671)
Title
Revises provisions governing the use of apprentices on public works. (BDR 53-671)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1028.) To printer. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 484.) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |