NV SB37 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to professions; revising the scope of the practice of clinical professional counseling and the practice of marriage and family therapy; revising the expiration date of certain licenses issued by the Board; revising provisions relating to the issuance of a license by endorsement; revising provisions governing the fees the Board is authorized to charge; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the regulation of marriage and family therapists and clinical professional counselors. (BDR 54-250)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-22SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 520.) To printer.
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-21SenateFrom printer.
2018-11-19SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback