NV SB368 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 534.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for compensation of state employees. (BDR S-113)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for compensation of state employees. (BDR S-113)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 534.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateAssembly Amendment Nos. 1060 and 1164 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint .
2017-06-05AssemblyTo printer.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.)
2017-06-05AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1164.)
2017-06-05AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-06-05AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-06-02AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-06-02AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1060.) To printer.
2017-06-01AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-23SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-22SenateTo printer.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
2017-05-22SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 818.)
2017-05-19SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-19SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2017-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2017-05-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 642.) To printer.
2017-05-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-13SenateWaiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.
2017-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=814
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB368.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB368_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB368_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB368_R3.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB368_R4.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB368_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=793&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=368&fldBillname=SB368
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1448&fldReprint=3&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=368&fldBillname=SB368

Bill Comments

feedback