NV SB367 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Chapter 408. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Chapter 408. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public safety; prescribing the unit of prosecution for certain crimes involving the ownership or possession of a firearm by certain prohibited persons; authorizing a juvenile justice agency and the juvenile court to release certain information and records for the purpose of conducting a background check relating to the sale or transfer of a firearm; requiring a court to transmit to the Central Repository for Nevada Records of Criminal History certain records relating to the court-ordered admission to certain mental health facilities of certain children with an emotional disturbance for certain purposes relating to the purchase or possession of a firearm; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to public safety. (BDR 15-942)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Chapter 408. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 415.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |