NV SB364 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 533. (Effective June 16, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 533. (Effective June 16, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cultural remains; requiring, under certain circumstances, a law enforcement agency to communicate with an Indian tribe or notify the Office of Historic Preservation of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources regarding certain human remains; requiring the Office to deliver certain regulations to the Legislative Counsel; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to cultural remains. (BDR 33-533)
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] | Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R] | Sen. Heidi Gansert [R] | Sen. Edgar Flores [D] |
Sen. Ira Hansen [R] | Sen. Dallas Harris [D] | Sen. Julie Pazina [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 533. (Effective June 16, 2023) |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 928 concurred in. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 928.) To printer. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 813.) |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 391.) Taken from General File. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |