NV SB36 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 195.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 195.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to local governments; revising certain provisions relating to the purchase of real property by a board of county commissioners; revising certain provisions relating to the appraised value of certain real property a board of county commissioners or governing body of a city offers for sale or lease; revising certain requirements for a board of county commissioners or governing body of a city to provide notice when offering certain real property at auction; authorizing a board of county commissioners or governing body of a city to offer real property at auction on the Internet or other electronic medium; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the purchase, sale or lease of real property by a local government. (BDR 20-489)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 195. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 21.) To printer. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-21 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |