NV SB357 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; establishing the Transportation Modernization Grants Program Account for the purpose of providing grants of money to school districts, charter schools and other entities to provide certain transportation options to pupils; authorizing a school district to use certain money appropriated to the school district to provide grants to parents or guardians of pupils to support the transportation of pupils; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the transportation of pupils. (BDR 34-190)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06Senate(No further action taken.)
2023-04-13SenateNotice of exemption.
2023-03-23SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-22SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback