NV SB349 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health; providing that an ordinance for the licensing and regulating of farmers' markets may not prohibit the sale of unpackaged produce at a licensed farmers' market; providing that the State Board of Health or a local board of health may not adopt regulations that prohibit the sale of unpackaged produce at a licensed farmers' market; authorizing the governing body of a county or city to allow the use of certain land for community composting; authorizing a governing body of a county or city to establish an urban composting zone; providing that a master plan adopted by a planning commission or the governing body of a county or city may include an urban composting element; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to public health. (BDR 40-90)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.) |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 609.) To printer. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | To Assembly. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 272.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |