NV SB347 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 542.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 542.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to higher education; creating the Task Force on Sexual Misconduct at Institutions of Higher Education; prescribing the membership, duties and compensation of the Task Force; authorizing the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada to appoint researchers to develop a climate survey on sexual misconduct; authorizing the Board of Regents to require the institutions within the Nevada System of Higher Education to administer the climate survey to students; authorizing the imposition of additional requirements for the grievance process at an institution within the System; authorizing the Board of Regents to require each institution within the System to adopt a policy on sexual misconduct, enter into a memorandum of understanding with certain organizations and designate an advocate; prohibiting an institution within the System from imposing certain sanctions on certain students; authorizing the Board of Regents to require an institution within the System to take certain actions regarding a report of an alleged incident of sexual misconduct; providing for certain training and programming related to sexual misconduct; authorizing a student who has experienced sexual misconduct to request a waiver from certain requirements of scholarships or academic activities; authorizing the Board of Regents to require an annual report from institutions within the System on certain information relating to sexual misconduct; authorizing the Board of Regents to adopt regulations; making certain information relating to incidents of sexual misconduct confidential; revising provisions relating to tuition charges; revising requirements relating to certain scholarships and grants; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing sexual misconduct in institutions of the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-237)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | Chapter 542. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 542. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 868 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 868.) |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 682.) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 436.) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |