NV SB347 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to enable junior high schools and middle schools that are low performing academically to provide programs and services to certain pupils. (BDR S-219)
Title
Makes an appropriation to enable junior high schools and middle schools that are low performing academically to provide programs and services to certain pupils. (BDR S-219)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=777 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB347.pdf |