NV SB345 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 439.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 439.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to estate distilleries; authorizing brew pubs and certain wineries to transfer certain malt beverages and wine in bulk to an estate distillery; authorizing a wholesale dealer of liquor to make such a transfer; authorizing an estate distillery to receive malt beverages and wine in bulk for the purpose of distillation and blending; revising when certain spirits that are received or transferred in bulk are subject to taxation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing estate distilleries. (BDR 52-980)
Sponsors
Sen. James Settelmeyer [R] | Sen. Robin Titus [R] | Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] | Rep. Jill Tolles [R] |
Rep. John Ellison [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 439. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 758 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 758.) To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 468.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |