NV SB344 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; prohibiting certain practices that impede public comment at meetings of boards of trustees of large school districts and local school precincts; requiring large school districts to undergo certain audits regardless of the availability of certain funds; prescribing certain requirements for obtaining a license to serve as a substitute teacher; requiring evaluations for certain school officials; prohibiting certain governing bodies from using certain methods to sponsor or operate a charter school; authorizing all employers to provide paid leave for certain employees to attend certain school meetings; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-4)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-20Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2023-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2023-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
2023-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2023-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 411.) To printer.
2023-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-03-21SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback