NV SB344 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 539.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises various provisions relating to the labeling, packaging and advertising of marijuana. (BDR 40-451)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises various provisions relating to the labeling, packaging and advertising of marijuana. (BDR 40-451)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 539.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateAssembly Amendment Nos. 881 and 1114 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-04SenateAction reconsidered.
2017-06-04SenateAssembly Amendment Nos. 881 and 1114 concurred in.
2017-06-04SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-03AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-06-03AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-03AssemblyTo printer.
2017-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: None, Excused: 4, Not voting: 1.)
2017-06-03AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1114.)
2017-06-03AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 881.) To printer.
2017-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-02AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-19AssemblyWaiver granted effective: May 19, 2017.
2017-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 272.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-21SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=760
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB344.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB344_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB344_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB344_R3.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB344_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=368&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=344&fldBillname=SB344
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1319&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=344&fldBillname=SB344
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1319&fldReprint=3&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=344&fldBillname=SB344

Bill Comments

feedback