NV SB343 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to controlled substances; establishing the crime of low-level trafficking in illicitly manufactured fentanyl, any derivative of fentanyl or any mixture which contains fentanyl or any derivative of fentanyl; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to fentanyl and derivatives of fentanyl. (BDR 40-501)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-20 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 421.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |