NV SB343 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Secretary of State to collect and report information related to gender equality in the workplace. (BDR 7-990)
Title
Requires the Secretary of State to collect and report information related to gender equality in the workplace. (BDR 7-990)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 944.) |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 465.) |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |