NV SB342 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 65.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 65.
Summary
Expands the relatives who receive preference when a child is placed in the custody of a person other than the parent of the child by a court, an agency which provides child welfare services or other person. (BDR 38-478)
Title
Expands the relatives who receive preference when a child is placed in the custody of a person other than the parent of the child by a court, an agency which provides child welfare services or other person. (BDR 38-478)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 65. | |
2009-05-05 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-02 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-01 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-02 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-01 | Read second time. | |
2009-03-30 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-24 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=947 |