NV SB341 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to dentists. (BDR 57-261)
Title
Revises provisions relating to dentists. (BDR 57-261)
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Smith [D] | Sen. Aaron Ford [D] | Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] |
Sen. Kelvin Atkinson [D] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. Ruben Kihuen [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] |
Rep. Amber Joiner [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 423. |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 841 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 841.) To printer. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2015-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 482.) To printer. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |