NV SB338 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to fireworks; requiring the State Fire Marshal to adopt certain regulations regarding fireworks; authorizing the State Fire Marshal to conduct certain actions regarding fireworks; requiring the regulations and ordinances adopted by certain governmental entities to be at least as restrictive as the regulations adopted by the State Fire Marshal; providing that such regulations and ordinances concerning the matter of fireworks do not apply to and do not prohibit the manufacture of fireworks for, or the transportation or sale of fireworks to, Indian reservations and Indian colonies; requiring a person to reimburse the State Fire Marshal and certain governmental entities under certain circumstances for the improper storage or use of fireworks; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to the regulation of fireworks. (BDR 42-34)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-04-23SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 574.)
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-09SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-20SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback