NV SB336 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 217.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to days of observance; requiring the Governor annually to proclaim July 28 to be Buffalo Soldiers Day in Nevada; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Governor to annually proclaim July 28 as Buffalo Soldiers Day in the State of Nevada. (BDR 19-791)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateChapter 217.
2019-05-29SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-28SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-24SenateAssembly Amendment No. 717 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 717.) To printer.
2019-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-08SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 93.) To printer.
2019-04-05SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-20SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback