NV SB334 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes to exempt sales of certain durable medical equipment, mobility-enhancing equipment, hearing aids, hearing aid accessories, and ophthalmic or ocular devices or appliances from sales and use taxes and analogous taxes. (BDR 32-262)
Title
Proposes to exempt sales of certain durable medical equipment, mobility-enhancing equipment, hearing aids, hearing aid accessories, and ophthalmic or ocular devices or appliances from sales and use taxes and analogous taxes. (BDR 32-262)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee. |
2015-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 435.) To printer. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |