NV SB33 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 145.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 145.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to natural resource management; replacing the term reforestation with revegetation; expanding the types of vegetation and areas where vegetation is located that the State Forester Firewarden is responsible for conserving, protecting and enhancing; expanding the application of certain provisions governing forests and watersheds to include rangelands; repealing the requirement to carry out certain tasks related to fire retardant roofing, fire-hazardous forested areas and ensuring consistency with fire codes, rules and regulations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises certain provisions relating to natural resource management. (BDR 47-312)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Chapter 145. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 545 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 545.) To printer. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 16.) To printer. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |