NV SB325 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 593.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 593.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing medical assistance to certain children. (BDR 38-941)
Title
Revises provisions governing medical assistance to certain children. (BDR 38-941)
Sponsors
Sen. Yvanna Cancela [D] | Sen. Richard Segerblom [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] | Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] |
Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. Patricia Farley [I] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 593. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1006.) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |