NV SB320 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Legislature; requiring the Legislative Counsel Bureau to pay a certain amount to the Public Employees' Benefits Program if certain members of the Senate or Assembly elect to participate in the Program; requiring any such member to arrange to pay the Program the cost of premiums and contributions to the Program; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions related to the Legislature. (BDR 23-194)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06Senate(No further action taken.)
2023-04-20SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2023-04-19SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer.
2023-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 466.) Taken from General File.
2023-04-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-04-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-04-06SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2023-03-21SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback