NV SB319 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 83rd Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 83rd Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public employees; revising the definition of employee for purposes of collective bargaining for state employees to include category I, II and III peace officers who are in the unclassified service of the State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to public employees. (BDR 23-953)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 83rd Session) |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |