NV SB317 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to preferences in bidding for certain contracts for businesses based in this State. (BDR 28-936)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to preferences in bidding for certain contracts for businesses based in this State. (BDR 28-936)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-05-31AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateTo printer.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.)
2017-05-31SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 1002 and 1005.)
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-31SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-24SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-24SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-21SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-21SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 450.)
2017-04-21SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-21SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback