NV SB316 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state financial administration; providing for the use of certain federal funding for a pilot program for certain pupils enrolled in a public high school; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides for the use of certain federal funding for a pilot program for certain pupils enrolled in a public high school. (BDR S-943)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7936/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB316.pdf |