NV SB315 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 261.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health; creating the Rare Disease Advisory Council within the Department of Health and Human Services; requiring information concerning the importance of annual physical examinations for children to be provided in certain programs, activities, notifications and courses; providing for the issuance of special license plates to increase awareness of childhood cancer; exempting the special license plates from certain provisions otherwise applicable to special license plates; requiring certain licensing boards to encourage continuing education in the diagnosis of rare diseases and disseminate information concerning childhood cancers; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to public health. (BDR 40-581)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 261.
2019-05-25SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-21AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2019-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 542.) To printer.
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback