NV SB311 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 280.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to credit; prohibiting discrimination against a person who seeks to obtain credit; revising provisions governing discrimination based on the marital status of a person who seeks to obtain credit; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions prohibiting certain discriminatory practices against a person seeking credit. (BDR 52-1048)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-01SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 280.
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-28SenateAssembly Amendment No. 916 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-27SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-27AssemblyTo Senate.
2019-05-27AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-24AssemblyTo printer.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.)
2019-05-24AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 916.)
2019-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-23AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-04-16AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-15SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-10SenateRead second time.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback