NV SB31 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 144.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 144.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public safety; authorizing the Central Repository for Nevada Records of Criminal History to monitor the agencies of criminal justice in this State for compliance with certain requirements relating to the submission or transmission of certain information and records concerning public safety; providing that if the Central Repository chooses to perform such monitoring, the Central Repository must prepare and post on its Internet website an annual report relating to the compliance of such agencies of criminal justice in this State with such requirements; revising the definition of a record of criminal history; revising the requirements for publication of certain statistical data; revising provisions relating to the information provided to an authorized participant of a service to conduct a name-based search of records of criminal history; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to public safety. (BDR 14-337)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Chapter 144. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 534 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 534.) To printer. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |