NV SB306 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 266.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to liens on real property located within a common-interest community. (BDR 10-55)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to liens on real property located within a common-interest community. (BDR 10-55)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-27SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 266.
2015-05-26SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-22SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2015-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-20AssemblyRead second time.
2015-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-04-24AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-24AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-21SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-04-21SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 442.) To printer.
2015-04-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-18SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback