NV SB302 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental administration; revising provisions relating to the Office of Minority Health and Equity of the Department of Health and Human Services; requiring the Legislative Auditor to include certain information relating to persons employed as a director or chief executive officer in the report of an audit to the extent of money available; declaring the policy of this State concerning employee diversity for state employers; requiring public employers to provide racial equity training to the extent of money available; requiring public officers and employees to complete any such training offered; requiring the Legislative Counsel to develop a racial equity worksheet to the extent of money available and include any such worksheet on the form on which a request for the drafting of a legislative measure must be made; imposing certain requirements concerning expenditures relating to certain health matters; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to governmental administration. (BDR 18-171)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7914/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB302.pdf |