NV SB301 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 83rd Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 83rd Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public works; revising provisions governing the circumstances under which a worker is deemed to be employed on a public work; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing public works. (BDR 28-967)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 83rd Session) |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 949 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Action reconsidered. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 949 not concurred in. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | To printer. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.) |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 949.) |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Action of passage reconsidered. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 16, Excused: 2.) |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 781.) |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 464.) Taken from General File. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |