NV SB300 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 108.
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 108.
Summary
Requires the acceptance of the donation of certain improvements on certain state land by the Division of State Lands of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources. (BDR S-974)
Title
Requires the acceptance of the donation of certain improvements on certain state land by the Division of State Lands of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources. (BDR S-974)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 108. | |
2009-05-13 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-08 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-06 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-17 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. | |
2009-04-17 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-16 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 390.) To printer. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=863 |