NV SB3 | 2020 | 32nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to unemployment compensation; authorizing the electronic transmission of certain documents and communications relating to unemployment compensation; revising the procedures for the adoption of an emergency regulation by the Administrator of the Employment Security Division of the Department of Employment, Training and Rehabilitation; revising provisions relating to eligibility for unemployment benefits in certain circumstances; authorizing the Administrator to suspend, modify, amend or waive certain requirements under certain circumstances; revising provisions governing the payment of unemployment benefits for an extended period and increasing the total extended benefits payable under certain circumstances; revising provisions relating to disqualification for unemployment compensation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to unemployment compensation. (BDR 53-10)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-07SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 7.
2020-08-05SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2020-08-04SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2020-08-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.
2020-08-04AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2020-08-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2020-08-04AssemblyTo committee.
2020-08-04AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole.
2020-08-04AssemblyIn Assembly.
2020-08-04SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly.
2020-08-03SenateTo printer.
2020-08-03SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2020-08-03SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2020-08-03SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 4.)
2020-08-03SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2020-08-03SenateRead second time.
2020-08-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2020-08-02SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2020-08-02SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback