NV SB298 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 145.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to residential facilities for groups; prescribing certain grounds for disciplinary action against a residential facility for groups; prohibiting certain persons from serving as the representative of a resident of a residential facility for groups for purposes relating to an involuntary discharge; imposing requirements governing certain contracts between a resident and a residential facility for groups; prohibiting the involuntary discharge of a resident of a residential facility for groups except for certain reasons; imposing requirements governing the procedure for such an involuntary discharge; requiring the State Long-Term Care Ombudsman to provide certain assistance concerning such a discharge; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the involuntary discharge of a resident from a residential facility for groups. (BDR 40-301)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 145.
2023-05-26SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-05-24SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2023-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.
2023-05-22AssemblyRead second time.
2023-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2023-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
2023-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2023-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 355.) To printer.
2023-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-03-17SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/10167/Overview
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/SB/SB298.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/SB/SB298_R1.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/SB/SB298_EN.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/Amendments/A_SB298_355.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=9894&voteResultPanel=All
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=10128&voteResultPanel=All
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=11222&voteResultPanel=All
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=11452&voteResultPanel=All

Bill Comments

feedback