NV SB283 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Chapter 393.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Chapter 393.
Summary
Revises provisions governing the rights of domestic partners. (BDR 11-1100)
Title
Revises provisions governing the rights of domestic partners. (BDR 11-1100)
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Coffin [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Chapter 393. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. | |
2009-05-31 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-31 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-31 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) | |
2009-05-30 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | To Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) | |
2009-05-30 | Made Special Order of Business for Saturday, May 30, 2009, at 6:42 p.m. | |
2009-05-26 | Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. | |
2009-05-25 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-19 | Assembly Amendment No. 674 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-16 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-15 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 14, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-14 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 674.) To printer. | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-13 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-22 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-22 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-21 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-21 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 528.) To printer. | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-21 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-26 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=764 |