NV SB280 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 552.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 552.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to common-interest communities. (BDR 10-863)
Title
Revises provisions relating to common-interest communities. (BDR 10-863)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 552. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . |
2013-06-03 | Senate | To printer. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Senate. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 777 and further amend. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | Assembly Amendment No. 777 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 777 not concurred in. To Assembly. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 6, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 777.) To printer. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 339.) To printer. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |